+ − Actions (17)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor