+ − Actions (50)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On December 2, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor