+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor