+ − Actions (19)
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On December 2, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor