+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor