+ − Actions (49)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor