+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed