+ − Actions (32)
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed