+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/2/2019
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor