+ − Actions (45)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed