+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Bonnen, Dennis
Type:
Primary Sponsor