+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 3, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor