+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Turner, Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor