+ − Actions (30)
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed