+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor