+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Transportation
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- Filed