+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor