+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 23, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor