+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor