+ − Actions (33)
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor