+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor