+ − Actions (69)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 21, 2008 in the House:
- Filed