+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/18/2021
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor