+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor