+ − Actions (16)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor