+ − Actions (60)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor