+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor