+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Correction in referral
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed