+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Point of order sustained
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Point of order overruled
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed