+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed