+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/15
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Posting rule suspended
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed