+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/21/2021
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/15/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/8/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor