+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor