+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 3rd time
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed