+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/12/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On November 13, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor