+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/17
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor