+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On November 13, 2018 in the House:
- Filed