+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed