+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor