+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed