+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Vote reconsidered
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed