+ − Actions (29)
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor