+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 19, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor