+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/7/2021
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor