+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor