+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
- Point of order sustained
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor