+ − Actions (30)
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Rules suspended
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed