+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor