+ − Actions (16)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor