+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (88)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House discharges conferees
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- House discharges conferees-reported
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the House
- Read first time
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment as amended withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor